Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, HARDWICK
Charity number: 1188527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Clare Louise Coates | Chair | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Bigg | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeffrey Lyndon Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Jane Vyse McNeill | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Patricia Frettsome | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Carol Maguire | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Denise Marcus | Trustee | 03 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET HAYMAN | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JANE ELIZABETH MUNCEY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Prof CHRISTOPHER JOHN BRISTOW FORD | Trustee | 01 June 1993 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.