Trustees PARISH OF WYKE REGIS, ALL SAINTS WITH ST EDMUND
Charity number: 1193556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alasdair Stewart Kay | Chair | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Amy Roff | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lynda Ferry | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Marilyn Anne Mackenzie | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Stanley George Berry | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lyndsay Wiles | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Robert William Smith | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lorraine Elizabeth Ovenden | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Maxine Elisabeth Foster | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Julie Lorraine Norris | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Derek Rodney Griffin | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jeffrey Thomas | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Leslie Donald Seamark | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Judy Patricia Margaret Walbrin | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Maxine Angela LEGG | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Michael John DILLISTONE | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Cheryl Loretta Mary WISE | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Caroline Elizabeth Elliott | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Gary Richard Hepburn | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.