Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, NORRIS BANK
Charity number: 1196002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Helen Carpentier Alting | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
David Warburton | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bradshaw | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Benjamin Criddle | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Margaret Rose Sant | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Hatley | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Eleanor Prescott | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATE HEATHER BUTT | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Edward Rubie | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Gaskins on behalf of St Martins Stockport | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Joan Davidson | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Shepherd | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV PAUL GORDON JUMP | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Matthew Bull | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.