Governing document THE SILK HERITAGE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF MUSEUM AND ANCILLARY FACILITIES. 2) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.