Trustees SAMPSON'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 1200297
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Harold David Uffindell | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Mark Berezicki | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jonathan Allen | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Leach | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lesley Clarke | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nigel Marriott | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joanna Penelope Clay | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.