Trustees DURHAM SOUTH COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 520718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Redhead | Chair | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Lawton | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Thompson | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE HARDMAN | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Tracey Cammock | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Robinson | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Maddison | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Buckingham | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Doubleday | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Nimmo | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Layfield-Carroll | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Purdom | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Hales | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bissett | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debby Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ross | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA Carvey | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.