Trustees THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN AND ST CUTHBERT OF DURHAM
Charity number: 1205971
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE VERY REVD PHILIP PLYMING | Chair | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Canon Paul Chandler | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Canon Jonathan Ward | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Canon Dr Maria Cockerill | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
The Revd Canon Michael Everitt | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Roy Thurston | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|||||
The Revd Canon Michael Hampel | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|||||
The Revd Canon Charlotte Allen | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Professor Simon Oliver | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.