Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION NORTH WEST ENGLAND
Charity number: 521654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rona Rommel | Chair | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Chapman-Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Long | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Clarkson | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Macaulay | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Keller | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rose Bode | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Robinson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Su Simpson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ramsden | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Pearson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Patricia Beesley | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Johnson | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicola Barker | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Marie Steele | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Weaver | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
SARAH ELIZABETH BEALE | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Elaine Disley | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.