Governing document OGLETHORPE AND DAWSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1964, 21 OCTOBER 1971 AND BY RESOLUTION DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 04 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. EXHIBITIONS, GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR PURPOSESOF EDUCATION, TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.
Area of benefit
TADCASTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.