Trustees THE MARKET PLACE (LEEDS)
Charity number: 701285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Hall Jones | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ellen Horton | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Canon Paul Dorian Maybury | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Jane Elizabeth Mischenko | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Forrest | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Satbinder Singh Soor | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Murray | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kirsty Louise Wilson | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Martin David Dickson | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Gerard Gillen | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.