Trustees GLADSTONE'S LIBRARY
Charity number: 701399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Collins | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Davies | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louisiana Lush | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Evenbeck | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gladstone | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martyn Percy | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SYKES | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Freddie Baveystock | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAMIAN BARR | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LLYR WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SIR DAVID NICHOLAS CANNADINE | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|||||
PATRICK SIBLEY JAN DERHAM OBE | Trustee | 05 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ANGUS GLADSTONE | Trustee |
|
||||||
RT REVD GREGORY KENNETH CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.