Governing document DEVON GARDENS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 24TH SEPTEMBER 1988 , 3RD FEBRUARY 2001 AND 12TH MARCH 2005. as amended on 07 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF GARDEN LAND. B.TO PRESERVE ENHANCE AND RECREATE FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC WHATEVER GARDEN LAND MAY EXIST OR HAVE EXISTED IN AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF DEVON.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.