Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL HORSHAM
Charity number: 1000327
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Ramjeet | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Picton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mogridge | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Allen | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Duff | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma McLaughlin | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisa Barnett | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pearson | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Summerfield | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ayres | Trustee | 22 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Muggeridge | Trustee | 22 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hossack | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Holden | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.