Trustees 1ST WICKFORD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1001145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Terrell | Chair | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akinwunmi Savage | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Barnes | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dean | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Hoyle | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hogg | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tina Anne Grimble | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carol Nelson | Trustee | 19 December 2007 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LEES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.