Trustees THE LIVERPOOL INSTITUTE FOR PERFORMING ARTS
Charity number: 1001565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stella OKAFOR- ROSS | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley John HERMAN | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Fletcher | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR SEAN McNAMARA | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joe Johnson | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Johnson | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
GINA ROSALIND CARTER | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID AARON RHYS OWEN | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA LUCY FEA | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ROSEMARY WORKMAN | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL BEGG | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER THOMAS DOW | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JEFFREY FOWLER | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE JOYCE ELLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK PHILIP FEATHERSTONE-WITTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY MICHAEL GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.