Trustees VILLAGE CLUB
Charity number: 1001694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Neil Chinery | Chair | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carey Taylor | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bob Rixon | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara McLaughlin | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fran Desborough | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pitkeathly | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susie Cooke | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Corsan | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Peters | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Canham | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Colette Hammond | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayes Eileen | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Clements | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hudson-Jary | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.