Trustees THE HANFORD SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1001751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW DAVID HUSSEY | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Charles Nicholas Dawson | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNA LOUISE RAINSFORD | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUTH MARY SULLIVAN | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARTIN SCOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MARY MAGDALENE WITHERIDGE | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATE MARY SAKER | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHE NIGEL PAUL STOURTON | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.