Governing document EAST GRINSTEAD OPERATIC SOCIETY (EGOS)
Charity number: 1002309
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST MARCH 1991 AS AMENDED 22ND NOVEMBER 1991, 29 NOVEMBER 1992, 13 DECEMBER 1996 AND 27 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN EAST GRINSTEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
EAST GRINSTEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.