Trustees AXIS WEB
Charity number: 1002841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Stansbie | Chair | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Diana Ali | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Edwin Colyer | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Radhika Patel | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Karen Newall | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Nelson | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juan Carlos Candanedo Saez | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Slingsby | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Grady | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Williams | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Wilcox-Baker | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.