Trustees NETHERAVON FITTLETON AND HAXTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1003542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Perry | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Brown | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Kim Symes | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Ayling | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fittleton cum Haxton Parish Council | Trustee | 10 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jackaman | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Alan Keith Brown | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Coslett | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Aubrey-Fletcher | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Netheravon Parish Council | Trustee | 01 September 1987 |
|
|
||||
MRS G MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.