Trustees LEARNING PARTNERSHIPS
Charity number: 1003603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS MURRAY | Chair | 14 October 2010 |
|
|||||||||||||
Denise Patricia Chong | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charles Martin Luke Beech | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Martin Tudge | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Antony Dennis Warren | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JOHN CLARE | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MR JHJ HOSEGOOD | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JEREMY JOHN BURTON DL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.