Trustees SOMERSET CHAMBER CHOIR
Charity number: 1003687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN MALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MELANIE RENDELL | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY EDWIN LEIGH | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE ANITA HARRIS B Ed Hons MA | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE JOY MILBURN BA HONS | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raymond William Singleton | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LIN WINSTON | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP RICHARD BEVAN B.Sc ECON | Trustee | 20 July 2014 |
|
|||||
TIM LEWIS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.