Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN BATH ( U 3 A IN BATH )
Charity number: 1004449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE BANKS | Chair | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Oldfield | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Snashall | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Marke Mr | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Ellington | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Duck | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Corcoran | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Weinle Mr | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Barron | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BETHELL | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.