Trustees GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1008034
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Oldershaw | Chair | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Drinkell | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kirk | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Elaine Pett | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edward Douglass | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL DILLON | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Lawrence John Robertson Brown | Trustee | 01 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
Michael Desmond Connor | Trustee | 09 May 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.