Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF ADDICTION
Charity number: 1009826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Owen Bowden-Jones | Chair | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Iain David Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kyla Hayley Thomas | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Philip Sharman | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew James Field | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clarissa Edwards | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Ersche | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Freeman | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Welch | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arun Dhandayudham | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MATTHEW HICKMAN | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JULIA SINCLAIR | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.