Trustees HEREFORDSHIRE AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE CANAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1010721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Roger Morgan | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Higgins | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Quentin Hargreaves | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Appleton | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Moreland | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elaine Barber | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Marshall | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RALPH BARBER | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward John Helps | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.