Trustees THE ROYAL OBSERVER CORPS MUSEUM TRUST
Charity number: 1012451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Anthony Benson BEM,FRMetS | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Arnott MSc | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Woodrow Shere MA ,MRaeS | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH EDWARD ARNOLD | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Carolyn Morris LLB | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Jennifer HOLDEN MBE | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KENNETH MERRITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Neville Cullingford DMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP SYDNEY PERCIVAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM VIRGO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MCCOWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.