Linked charities THE VINTNERS' FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1015212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1983, AS VARIED BY DEED OF VARIATION 1ST MARCH 1993, AND SCHEME 28TH SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RESCUE AND PROVIDE CARE SHELTER AND TREATMENT FOR STRAY NEGLECTED AND INJURED SWANS, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECT OF POLLUTION AND POLLUTANTS ON SWANS OF THE RIVERS AND WATERWAYS OF THE UNITED KINGDON, TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO SUCH INCIDENCE AND EFFECT AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Registration history
- 07 September 1983 : Standard registration
- 13 December 2023 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.