Trustees PLYMOUTH PROPRIETARY LIBRARY
Charity number: 1015700
Charity reporting is overdue by 627 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER GREGORY CARPENTER | Chair | 25 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Bartlett | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Elaine Audrey Henderson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smerdon | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Paterson | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Greenhalgh | Trustee | 21 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Blackman | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.