Trustees 1ST WILLASTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1015965
Charity reporting is overdue by 151 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Remco Buckley | Chair | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jones | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Morgan | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Emmerson | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Evans | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Holmes | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEAL HOLMES | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rawson | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denis Duret | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICKY RIDGWAY | Trustee | 05 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alison Winstanley | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.