Trustees THE GUILD OF GLASS ENGRAVERS
Charity number: 1016162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan David Monkcom | Chair | 15 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Claudia Phipps | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivana Zivkovic | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Page | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Elliott Heffer | Trustee | 21 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HOOK | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Pope | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY SHEPPARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.