Trustees INTERNATIONAL NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATION TRAINING AND RESEARCH CENTRE
Charity number: 1016676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Taylor | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David-Huw Owen | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Natasha Jamal | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Mills | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Smruti Patel | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Kojo VanDyck | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzanne Hammad | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Agnes Dejean | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ORCHARD | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.