Trustees CRINGLEFORD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1016909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Kiggins | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dean Mrs | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Reilly | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gladman | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gordon | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH BARNES | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|||||
SHEILA COE | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SMITH | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BERYL MADELINE CATCHPOLE | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALFREDA JILL HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.