Governing document MARY'S PILGRIMS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/09/1992 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 15 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CONVALESCENT PERSONS, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THE INFIRM AND THE SICK, BY TRANSPORTING OR ASSISTING IN THE TRANSPORT OF SUCH PERSONS WHETHER MOBILE, WHEELCHAIR USERS OR CONFINED TO BED, TO THE SHRINE OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES OR TO SUCH OTHER PLACES OF PILGRIMAGE AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.