Governing document POOLE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 1997, 11 FEBRUARY 2000, 15 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 24 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
POOLE, DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.