Trustees COUNTY OF NORTH TYNESIDE GUIDES
Charity number: 1020096
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Johnson | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thea Orrick | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kirkup | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Tindle | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lloyd | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chica Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Robson | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Barnfather | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.