Trustees RUSLAND PARISH AND READING ROOMS
Charity number: 1021099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHARLES WALTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirsty Mawhinney | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Benefield | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Michelle Bridgid Jordan | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Jarvis | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lumsden | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Hoyle | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGUS STANLEY HYDE ADAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
REV JOHN DIXON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.