Trustees 6TH BINGLEY (1ST HARDEN AND WILSDEN)SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1021184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan William Hammond | Chair | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Wood | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth MAitland | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Hinkles | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven JAmes Watt | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Silas Parker | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Peel | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Hird | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Booth | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN MAITLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.