Trustees 9TH HARPENDEN SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1021216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE MOORE | Chair | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Reid | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth David Green | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mellor | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Corran | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Falconer | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICK CORRAN | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY-ANN COLLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.