Trustees BAYSTON HILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1022037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Peel | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wain | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Williams | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Jones | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lindsay Jones | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Greaves | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANE MARY HOPWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.