Governing document WARWICKSHIRE CHILDREN AND VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 1991 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 1993, 15 MAY 1996, 9 JULY 2002 AND 7 JULY 2008.
Charitable objects
(1) TO MEET THE NEEDS AND ASPIRATIONS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY STRENGTHENING AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF ITS MEMBER ORGANISATIONS (2) TO HELP AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.