Accounts and annual returns FUND FOR NEEDY CHILDREN
Charity number: 1023216
Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 321 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 321 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 686 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 686 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1051 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1051 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1416 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1416 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1782 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1782 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window