Trustees IST HURSTPIERPOINT SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1023565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Libby | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Clarke | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Baker | Trustee | 16 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Childs | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hudson | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Derek Cornwell | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adele Peak | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Hush | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Libby | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.