Trustees 20TH TORBAY (GRAMMAR SCHOOL) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1024248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Jenkins | Chair | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Tier | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hedges | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shears | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fisher | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR PETER ALLAN SNOWDON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.