Accounts and annual returns 1ST SOLIHULL SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1024384
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
01 April 2023 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
18 March 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2019
(These accounts |
12 October 2020 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window