Trustees WORTWELL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1025885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Eddy | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tegan Emma Noy | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Battleday | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Worsfold | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles White | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Croxson | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Shailes | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM PLAYFORD | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Colyer | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lua Leggett | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA RUSTED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.