Governing document UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN KENNET (WILTSHIRE)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 25 Mar 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KENNET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.