Trustees ELLESMERE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1029099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Leonard | Chair | 03 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Hayes | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Heather Richardson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kirstine Anderson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scialpi-Sullivan | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Young | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Leonard | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Bond | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Reece McSherry | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Morrissey | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Scanlan | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Forrest | Trustee | 31 March 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.