Trustees NEWQUAY SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
Charity number: 1029134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Hilbery | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Macintosh | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McIntosh | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Sutherland | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Carter | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Love | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kipling | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Price | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sykes | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Selvey | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Holly Sykes | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.