Trustees BRANDON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1029166
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Ann Boone | Chair | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pittingale | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Masango | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Taylor | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE GOLDSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.